This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 02:34:17 (UTC).

CLASSIC MARITIME INC. VS LION DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS BHD

Case Summary

On 06/12/2017 CLASSIC MARITIME INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LION DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS BHD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PETER A. HERNANDEZ, DUKES, ROBERT A. and OKI, DAN THOMAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9375

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

DUKES, ROBERT A.

OKI, DAN THOMAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CLASSIC MARITIME IMC

CLASSIC MARITIME INC.

Defendants

LION DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS BHD

BHD LION DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS

LIKOM CASEWORKS USA INC.

Interested Party

LIKMO CASEWORKS USA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HANSEN RUPERT P.

HANSEN RUPERT PAUL JR

Defendant Attorneys

ROSE BRADLEY MICHAEL

ROSE ESQ. BRADLEY M.

 

Court Documents

Unknown

6/12/2017: Unknown

Complaint

6/12/2017: Complaint

Summons

6/12/2017: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/12/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/13/2017: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown

7/11/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

7/11/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

7/11/2017: Unknown

Unknown

7/11/2017: Unknown

Unknown

7/11/2017: Unknown

Unknown

7/11/2017: Unknown

Unknown

7/11/2017: Unknown

Unknown

7/11/2017: Unknown

Undertaking

7/11/2017: Undertaking

Other -

7/20/2017: Other -

Other -

7/25/2017: Other -

Unknown

7/27/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/9/2017: Unknown

119 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketReply (MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT LIKOM CASEWORKS USA, INC.?S MOTION TO QUASH ATTACHMENT); Filed by LION DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS BHD (Defendant); Likom Caseworks USA, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by LION DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS BHD (Defendant); Likom Caseworks USA, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by CLASSIC MARITIME, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Briton P Sparkman); Filed by LION DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS BHD (Defendant); Likom Caseworks USA, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by LION DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS BHD (Defendant); Likom Caseworks USA, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketResponse (TO PLAINTIFF CLASSIC MARITIME, INC. MOTION TO COMPEL); Filed by LION DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS BHD (Defendant); Likom Caseworks USA, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (OF BRITON P. SPARKMAN); Filed by LION DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS BHD (Defendant); Likom Caseworks USA, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketOrder ([PROPOSED] ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPECTIVE RESPONSE BRIEFS TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONES TO DISCOVERY, AND DEFENDANTS MOTION TO QUASH ATTACHMENT AND DISMISS COMPLAINT); Filed by LION DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS BHD (Defendant); Likom Caseworks USA, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketObjection (OBJECTION TO AND PROVISIONAL OPPOSITION TO LIKOM USA'S MOTION); Filed by CLASSIC MARITIME, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration in Opposition to Motion); Filed by CLASSIC MARITIME, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
227 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2017
  • DocketDeclaration (OF TIMOTHY JAMES HOUGHTON IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DocketPoints and Authorities (IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DocketDeclaration (OF TIMOTHY JAMES HOUGHTON PURSUANT TO RULE 3.1204 OF THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CLASSIC MARITIME INC., (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CLASSIC MARITIME INC., (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****9375    Hearing Date: March 03, 2020    Dept: O

Plaintiff Classic Mariti o me, Inc.’s motion for leave to file third amended complaint is GRANTED.

Plaintiff Classic Maritime, Inc. (“Plaintiff”) moves for leave to file a Third Amended Complaint (“TAC”) pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 473.

“A court may, in furtherance of justice, and on such terms as may be proper, allow a party to amend any pleadings.” (CCP ; 473(a)(1).) Judicial policy favors resolution of all disputed matters between the parties in the same lawsuit. Thus, the courts discretion will usually be exercised liberally to permit amendments of the pleadings. (Nestle v. Santa Monica (1972) 6 Cal.3d 920, 939.)

Plaintiff proposes to add a cause of action for recognition of foreign judgment based on the newly final judgment that was rendered on December 3, 2019.

“A motion to amend a pleading before trial must… [s]tate what allegations in the previous pleading are proposed to be deleted, if any, and where, by page, paragraph, and line number, the deleted allegations are located; and [s]tate what allegations are proposed to be added to the previous pleading, if any, and where, by page, paragraph, and line number, the additional allegations are located.” (CRC 3.1324(a).)

The Court finds that the amendment is relatively minor and would not prejudice Defendants Lion Diversified Holdings BHD and Likom Caseworks USA Inc. (“Defendants”). The legal standard on a motion for leave is clear and favors liberally granting such motions. Defendants have not demonstrated any real prejudice they would suffer from this amendment. They haven’t alleged that far more additional discovery would need to be conducted. Furthermore, the arguments made by Defendants are not appropriate considerations for the Court on a motion for leave. If Defendants have concerns about the applicability of such a cause of action to them, they can make their arguments by filing a demurrer or a motion for judgment on the pleadings. At this stage and on this motion, however, the Court must grant Plaintiff leave to amend its complaint.

Motion is GRANTED. The TAC is deemed filed this date.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Classic Maritime Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hansen, Rupert P.