This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2022 at 09:53:56 (UTC).

CLARK MALONEY VS MOUNT SAN ANTONIO COLLEGE, A CALIFORNIA COMMUNITY COLLEGE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/13/2021 CLARK MALONEY filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against MOUNT SAN ANTONIO COLLEGE, A CALIFORNIA COMMUNITY COLLEGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5781

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MALONEY CLARK

Defendants

JENNUM JOE

MOUNT SAN ANTONIO COLLEGE A CALIFORNIA COMMUNITY COLLEGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEZA CONTRERAS NATHALIE ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

BAUERMEISTER LINDA S.

WALSH DENNIS J

 

Court Documents

Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)

9/30/2021: Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/25/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

10/25/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/29/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/29/2021: Case Management Statement

Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

11/15/2021: Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Demand for Jury Trial

9/20/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/20/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

9/20/2021: Answer

Answer

9/20/2021: Answer

Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF CARLOS E. MONTOYA

9/2/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF CARLOS E. MONTOYA

Proof of Personal Service

8/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

8/2/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Declaration - DECLARATION RE AUTOMATIC 30 DAY EXTENSION

8/20/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION RE AUTOMATIC 30 DAY EXTENSION

Declaration - DECLARATION RE DECL OF KOSTRENICH RE AUTOMATIC 30-DAY EXT

8/25/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION RE DECL OF KOSTRENICH RE AUTOMATIC 30-DAY EXT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/13/2021: Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2023
  • Hearing02/15/2023 at 11:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • Hearing02/03/2023 at 11:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketTrial Preparation Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by MOUNT SAN ANTONIO COLLEGE, a California Community College (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Joe Jennum (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Clark Maloney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Clark Maloney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order (eFiling); Filed by MOUNT SAN ANTONIO COLLEGE, a California Community College (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Supplemental Declaration of Carlos E. Montoya); Filed by Clark Maloney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (re Decl of Kostrenich re Automatic 30-Day Ext); Filed by Clark Maloney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Re Automatic 30 day extension); Filed by MOUNT SAN ANTONIO COLLEGE, a California Community College (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Clark Maloney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Clark Maloney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Clark Maloney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clark Maloney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Clark Maloney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOUNT SAN ANTONIO COLLEGE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathalie Meza Contreras