This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/30/2023 at 09:11:31 (UTC).

CLARK FARRELL BEGINA VS JC & BC, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/21/2022 CLARK FARRELL BEGINA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against JC BC, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0977

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEGINA CLARK FARRELL

Defendants

CHAING HOON AE

CHAING JUNG YONG

JC & BC INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALAVI AMIR TAHER

DIBA KASEY

Defendant Attorney

HUNT JULIE L.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Order

1/25/2023: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/25/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/24/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Mail

1/10/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

1/10/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

1/10/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/10/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/4/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/3/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by Mail

12/16/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Answer

12/16/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

10/31/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/31/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/31/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/21/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/21/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/21/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/21/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2024
  • Hearing05/06/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2024
  • Hearing04/26/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Case Management Order: Document changed from Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore to Case Management Order ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 04/26/2024 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketJury Trial 4-5 day estimate scheduled for 05/06/2024 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 38 updated: Result Date to 01/25/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Clark Farrell Begina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: JC & BC, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Hoon Ae Chaing (Defendant); Jung Yong Chaing (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maureen Duffy-Lewis in Department 38 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Clark Farrell Begina (Plaintiff); As to: JC & BC, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Hoon Ae Chaing (Defendant); Jung Yong Chaing (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clark Farrell Begina (Plaintiff); As to: JC & BC, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Hoon Ae Chaing (Defendant); Jung Yong Chaing (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Clark Farrell Begina (Plaintiff); As to: JC & BC, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Hoon Ae Chaing (Defendant); Jung Yong Chaing (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less