This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/09/2020 at 10:49:20 (UTC).

CLARISSA ANAYA, ET AL. VS ABRAHAM RENTERIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/03/2020 CLARISSA ANAYA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ABRAHAM RENTERIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0243

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANAYA CLARISSA

FERNANDEZ JACQUELINE

Defendants

RENTERIA JOSE

RENTERIA ABRAHAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARRIS KHAIL

 

Court Documents

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

4/9/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/3/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2023
  • Hearing04/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Hearing06/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Hearing05/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Clarissa Anaya (Plaintiff); Jacqueline Fernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Clarissa Anaya (Plaintiff); Jacqueline Fernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Clarissa Anaya (Plaintiff); Jacqueline Fernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.