Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/16/2021 at 02:17:27 (UTC).

CLARENCE CECIL IV DAVIS ET AL VS CITY OF GARDENA ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/30/2018 CLARENCE CECIL IV DAVIS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF GARDENA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9909

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Guardian Ad Litem

DAVIS CLARENCE CECIL IV

Defendants and Respondents

BELL SHAWNTAE LANAE

GARDENA CITY OF

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

CITY OF GARDENA

Minor

DAVIS ILIYAH CECIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor, Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF ALBERT CHANG

CHANG HYUNSUK ALBERT

RAMSEY HADI EDWARD

Defendant Attorneys

DUMONT LOUIS R

RUNDELL JOHNNY

 

Court Documents

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

1/15/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Request for Refund / Order

12/26/2019: Request for Refund / Order

Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/25/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

11/26/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Request for Refund / Order

7/8/2019: Request for Refund / Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

7/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

Notice of Ruling

7/17/2019: Notice of Ruling

Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/3/2019: Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CITY OF GARDENA'S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/27/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CITY OF GARDENA'S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION DEFENDANT CITY OF GARDENA'S DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 430.41(A(2)

3/19/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DEFENDANT CITY OF GARDENA'S DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 430.41(A(2)

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

4/18/2019: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Summons - SUMMONS FOR FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/3/2019: Summons - SUMMONS FOR FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

5/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

6/7/2019: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL - EX PARTE

9/5/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL - EX PARTE

SUMMONS -

9/7/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

8/30/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

8/30/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • Hearing09/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • Hearing08/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • Hearing08/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by City of Gardena (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Clarence Cecil IV Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by City of Gardena (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Gardena, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Defendant City of Gardena's Declaration Pursuant to 430.41(a(2)); Filed by Gardena, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL - EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Clarence Cecil Iv Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GARDENA CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF GARDENA is a litigant