This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/14/2017 at 13:11:58 (UTC).

CLAREMONTERS FOR HONEST GOVERNANCE ET AL V CITY OF CLAREMONT

Case Summary

On 05/15/2017 CLAREMONTERS FOR HONEST GOVERNANCE filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CITY OF CLAREMONT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB, RICHARD FRUIN, JAMES C. CHALFANT, TORRIBIO, JOHN A. and MARY H. STROBEL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9698

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB

RICHARD FRUIN

JAMES C. CHALFANT

TORRIBIO, JOHN A.

MARY H. STROBEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MCLOEOD MARTIN

CLAREMONTERS FOR HONEST GOVERNANCE

Defendants and Respondents

CLAREMONT CITY OF

DOES 1 TO 10

CLAREMONT CITY COUNCIL

Interested Parties

POMONA COLLEGE

ROES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WALLRAFF DEAN

Respondent Attorneys

BEST BEST & KRIEGER

WINTERSWYK ALISHA M.

Interested Party Attorney

COHEN ALBERT M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING

10/3/2017: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING

NOTICE OF ELECTION TO PREPARE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD

5/15/2017: NOTICE OF ELECTION TO PREPARE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD

VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

5/15/2017: VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

SUMMONS

5/15/2017: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/17/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/17/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Minute Order

5/19/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF TRIAL SELLING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

5/22/2017: NOTICE OF TRIAL SELLING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

NOTICE OF TRIAL SELLING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

5/22/2017: NOTICE OF TRIAL SELLING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

5/26/2017: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Unknown

6/5/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF CEQA SETTLEMENT MEETING

6/5/2017: NOTICE OF CEQA SETTLEMENT MEETING

PETITIONER AND PLAINTIFF MARTIN MCLEOD'S OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

6/5/2017: PETITIONER AND PLAINTIFF MARTIN MCLEOD'S OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Minute Order

6/6/2017: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL

6/9/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

6/9/2017: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

6/13/2017: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

DECLARATION OF ALISHA M. WINTERSWYK RE MEET AND CONFER BEFORE FILING DEMURRER

6/15/2017: DECLARATION OF ALISHA M. WINTERSWYK RE MEET AND CONFER BEFORE FILING DEMURRER

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketStipulation and Order (re retention of jurisdiction ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketRequest and Entry of Dismissal Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DocketNotice (OF TRIAL SETTING ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketNotice (of certification of administrative record ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketRequest (FOR HEARING "BY FAX" ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketNotice (OF ENTRY OF FURTHER STIP ) Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to extend deadlines re administra- tive record ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketDeclaration (OF JASON IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER ) Filed by Attorney for Real Pty in Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (OF DEMURRER DOCS ) Filed by Attorney for Real Pty in Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketJoinder (IN DEMURRER ) Filed by Attorney for Real Pty in Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2017
  • DocketNotice (OF CEQA SETTLEMENT MEETING ) Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • DocketNotice-Related Cases (WITH CASE BS163235 ) Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • DocketNotice-Related Cases (BS163235 ) Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketPetition-Writ-Mandate Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketNotice (OF ELECTION TO PREPARE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketPetition

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLAREMONT THE CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where POMONA COLLEGE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALLRAFF DEAN