This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2022 at 02:07:47 (UTC).

CLAIRE RAINEY VS A PLACE FOR ROVER, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/26/2021 CLAIRE RAINEY filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against A PLACE FOR ROVER, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAREN NELSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9459

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAREN NELSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAINEY CLAIRE

Defendant

A PLACE FOR ROVER INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CROSNER MICHAEL R.

Defendant Attorney

LECRONE JOHN P

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/26/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

1/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) OF 01/24/2022

1/24/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) OF 01/24/2022

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

1/20/2022: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT A PLACE FOR ROVER, INC. TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

1/14/2022: Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT A PLACE FOR ROVER, INC. TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

1/6/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

12/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;) OF 12/08/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

12/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;) OF 12/08/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Initial Status Conference Order

12/8/2021: Initial Status Conference Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • Hearing07/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 17 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • Docketat 4:19 PM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Removal to Federal Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Removal to Federal Court) of 01/24/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by A Place for Rover, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer (Of Defendant A Place For Rover, Inc. To Plaintiff's Complaint); Filed by A Place for Rover, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Claire Rainey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Regarding Newly Filed Class Action;) of 12/08/2021, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Regarding Newly Filed Class Action;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Claire Rainey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Claire Rainey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Claire Rainey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A PLACE FOR ROVER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Crosner, Michael R