This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/07/2021 at 04:16:23 (UTC).

CLAIRE NETTLETON ET AL VS KERRY MCFADDEN

Case Summary

On 02/22/2018 CLAIRE NETTLETON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KERRY MCFADDEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5437

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Guardian Ad Litems

EASTON W. DOUGLAS ESQ.

NETTLETON CLAIRE

Defendants and Respondents

MCFADDEN KERRY

DOES 1 TO 75

Minor

SLOSKY HENRY NETTLETON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorneys

EASTON W. DOUGLAS ESQ.

EASTON WILLIAM DOUGLAS ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

CHO DANIEL S.

 

Court Documents

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

1/5/2021: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

1/5/2021: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (NEEDS MINOR'S COMPROMISE PETITION)

3/23/2020: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (NEEDS MINOR'S COMPROMISE PETITION)

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

10/27/2020: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) - CONDITIONAL ...)

10/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) - CONDITIONAL ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUING THE 06/29/2020 ORDER TO SHOW CAUS...)

6/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUING THE 06/29/2020 ORDER TO SHOW CAUS...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)

3/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

1/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Settlement

1/8/2020: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 01/08/2020

1/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 01/08/2020

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

7/24/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Deposit - Jury

2/22/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/31/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

7/6/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

7/6/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEFENDANT KERRY MCFADDEN'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

7/6/2018: DEFENDANT KERRY MCFADDEN'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

3/9/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

SUMMONS

3/13/2018: SUMMONS

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • Hearing05/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Proof of Deposit of Monies Into Blocked Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Hearing05/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise (- Petitioner/Guardian Ad Litem, Claire Nettleton'sPetition to Approve Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment as to Minor Claimant Henry Nettleton Slosky (Age 4)) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Petitioner/Guardian Ad Litem, Claire Nettleton's P...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by Claire Nettleton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Claire Nettleton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for Failure of Plaintiff(s) to File a Petition for Approval of Minor's Compromise) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (- Conditional Settlement Filed 01/08/2020 (minors)) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Conditional ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketPetition to Approve Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment as to Minor Claimant Henry Nettleton Slosky (Age 4); Filed by Claire Nettleton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Claire Nettleton (Plaintiff); Henry Nettleton Slosky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Claire Nettleton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC695437    Hearing Date: January 05, 2021    Dept: 29

BC694437 Claire Nettleton, Henry Nettleton Slosky, a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Claire Nettleton v. Kerry McFadden

The Court excuses the personal appearance of the claimant, the guardian ad litem and counsel.  No appearances are necessary.

The Court has reviewed the Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action of a Minor (Henry Nettleton Slosky, Age 4). The Court finds that the settlement is reasonable, and based thereon, approves and GRANTS the petition.

The Court has considered the Declaration of Matthew D. Easton in support of the fee request. The Court finds that on the current record, and in consideration of the factors set forth in Cal Rules of Court, Rule 7.955(b), a fee of 25% of the gross settlement is reasonable.

The Court approves the following distribution of the settlement proceeds:

Attorney’s fees (25%)

$1,250.00

Medical expenses

0.00

Costs

0.00

Total fees and costs

$1,250.00

Total Settlement

$5,000.00

Less credits

-1,250.00

Net Settlement

$3,750.00

THE COURT SETS AN OSC RE PROOF OF DEPOSIT and OSC RE DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION  ON 05/05/2021 IN DEPARTMENT SSC-29 AT 8:30 AM. No appearance is required if proof of deposit and request for dismissal of entire action are  filed and entered prior to 05/05/2021.  

Moving party is ordered to give notice.