This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/17/2021 at 17:48:37 (UTC).

CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC VS CHARLES CAMPBELL ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/08/2017 CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHARLES CAMPBELL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3732

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

Defendants and Respondents

SPROUT MORTGAGE CORPORATION

CHANDLER ART

PALLANTE SHEA

ARAKELIAN GARY

DOES 1 TO 20

CAMPBELL CHARLES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DETTELBACH ALAN M. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

JACKSON LEWIS P.C.

P.C. JACKSON LEWIS

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF THE TRIAL DATE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

2/9/2018: PLAINTIFF CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF THE TRIAL DATE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Minute Order -

5/30/2018: Minute Order -

JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

12/5/2017: JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND ORDER REGARDING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

12/8/2017: NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND ORDER REGARDING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. MISAPPROPRIATION OF TRADE SECRETS; ETC

3/8/2017: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. MISAPPROPRIATION OF TRADE SECRETS; ETC

SUMMONS -

3/8/2017: SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

3/21/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF ERRATA RE COMPLAINT

3/29/2017: NOTICE OF ERRATA RE COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS SHEA PALLANTE'S AND SPROUT MORTGAGE CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

4/25/2017: DEFENDANTS SHEA PALLANTE'S AND SPROUT MORTGAGE CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT CHARLES V CAMPBELL'S NOTICE OF REARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC'S COMPLAINT

4/25/2017: DEFENDANT CHARLES V CAMPBELL'S NOTICE OF REARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC'S COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT ART CHANDLER'S NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC'S COMPLAINT

4/25/2017: DEFENDANT ART CHANDLER'S NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC'S COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT GARY ARAKELIAN?S NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC?S COMPLAINT

4/25/2017: DEFENDANT GARY ARAKELIAN?S NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC?S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

6/9/2017: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

6/26/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/14/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

DEFENDANTS CAMPBELL, CHANDLER AND ARAKELIAN'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

8/2/2017: DEFENDANTS CAMPBELL, CHANDLER AND ARAKELIAN'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER

8/9/2017: NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER

DEFENDANT RECOVCO MORTGAGE MANAGEMENT, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

8/21/2017: DEFENDANT RECOVCO MORTGAGE MANAGEMENT, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50; Status Conference (Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Civic Financial Services, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 50; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 50; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Civic Financial Services, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Civic Financial Services, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Civic Financial Services, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. MISAPPROPRIATION OF TRADE SECRETS; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Civic Financial Services, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

- T LT

3N oo oy

?IOT

NN o AW

DINSMORE & SANDELMANN LLP

Frank Sandelmann (SBN 186415) fsandelmann@lawinmb.com Brett Stroud (SBN 301777) bstroud@lawinmb.com

324 Manhattan Beach Blvd., Suite 201

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Telephone: (310) 318-1220

Facsimile: (310) 318-1223

Attorneys for Plaintiff Civic Financial Services, LLC

[additional attorney information on next page]

DEC 08 2017

Shem R, ¢,

rt . B,:e’flmflcm Jenny Chea Deputy

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC

| Case No.: BC653732

Plaintiff, | FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1.

MISAPPROPRIATION OF TRADE

SECRETS;

BREACH OF CONTRACT;

INTENTIONAL INTERFERENCE WITH CONTRACTUAL

RELATIONS;

CONSPIRACY TO INTENTIONALLY INTERFERE WITH CONTRACTUAL

RELATIONS;

INTENTIONAL INTERFERENCE WITH PROSPECTIVE

ECONOMIC ADVANTAGE;

CONSPIRACY TO INTENTIONALLY INTEREFERE WITH PROSPECTIVE

ECONOMIC ADVANTAGE; VIOLATION OF CAL.B & P CODE §17200.

BREACH OF DUTY OF LOYALTY FRAUD

Complaint Filed: March 8,2017 Trial Date: March 14,2018

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sprout Mortgage Coporation is a litigant

Latest cases where CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DETTELBACH ALAN M.