This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/19/2018 at 17:15:16 (UTC).

CITY TILE & STONE TILE INC VS ROBERT GRAHAM EVANS III ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/05/2017 CITY TILE STONE TILE INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ROBERT GRAHAM EVANS III. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6708

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CITY TILE & STONE TILE INC

Respondents and Defendants

PACIFIC WESTERN BANK

RUBICON B HACIENDA LLC

SMART GRID CONSTRUCTION

EVANS ROBERT GRAHAM. III

DOES 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

YADEGAR MINOOFAR & SOLEYMAN LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR REFUND

4/19/2017: REQUEST FOR REFUND

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/14/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

SUMMONS

4/5/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

4/5/2017: COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2017
  • REQUEST FOR REFUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by City Tile & Stone Tile, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by City Tile & Stone Tile, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY TILE STONE GRANITE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC WESTERN BANK A CALIFORNIA STATE-CHARTERED BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where RUBICON B HACIENDA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SMART GRID CONSTRUCTION is a litigant