Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/11/2021 at 00:05:25 (UTC).

CITY OF WEST COVINA VS BIG INDEPENDENT CITIES EXCESS POOL JOINT POWERS AUTHORITY

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 CITY OF WEST COVINA filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against BIG INDEPENDENT CITIES EXCESS POOL JOINT POWERS AUTHORITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5390

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF WEST COVINA

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

BIG INDEPENDENT CITIES EXCESS POOL JOINT POWERS AUTHORITY

Cross Defendant

CARL WARREN & COMPANY LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARK BRIAN Z.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

DEAL CHRISTOPHER

PISANO CHRISTOPHER MARK

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST...) OF 04/07/2021

4/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST...) OF 04/07/2021

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/24/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; CASE MANAGEME...)

3/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; CASE MANAGEME...)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE (TAMMIE MOORE, CSR # 11525)

3/24/2021: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE (TAMMIE MOORE, CSR # 11525)

Case Management Order

3/24/2021: Case Management Order

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

3/9/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

Case Management Statement

3/9/2021: Case Management Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION CITY OF WEST COVINAS OPPOSITION TO BIG INDEPENDENT CITIES EXCESS POOL JOINT POWERS AUTHORITYS DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/11/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION CITY OF WEST COVINAS OPPOSITION TO BIG INDEPENDENT CITIES EXCESS POOL JOINT POWERS AUTHORITYS DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/17/2021: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/5/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/8/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

12/23/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

12/16/2020: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/2/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/2/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/25/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/25/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • Hearing01/10/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • Hearing12/14/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • Hearing07/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Big Independent Cities Excess Pool Joint Powers Authority (Cross-Complainant); Big Independent Cities Excess Pool Joint Powers Authority (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Big Independent Cities Excess Pool Joint Powers Authority (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Big Independent Cities Excess Pool Joint Powers Authority (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Big Independent Cities Excess Pool Joint Powers Authority (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to First...) of 04/07/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to First...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Big Independent Cities Excess Pool Joint Powers Authority (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of West Covina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by City of West Covina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by City of West Covina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by City of West Covina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by City of West Covina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CARL WARREN & COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF WEST COVINA is a litigant