This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/19/2022 at 08:36:55 (UTC).

CITY OF TORRANCE VS SAMMY SINSAY SARIA

Case Summary

On 08/19/2022 CITY OF TORRANCE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SAMMY SINSAY SARIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6974

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF TORRANCE

Defendant

SARIA SAMMY SINSAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOLL JEFF

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/19/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/19/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

8/19/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

8/19/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/19/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

8/19/2022: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Complaint

8/19/2022: Complaint

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

10/25/2022: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2024
  • Hearing08/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2024
  • Hearing02/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2024
  • Hearing02/02/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: City of Torrance (Plaintiff); As to: Sammy Sinsay Saria (Defendant); Mailing Date: 10/20/2022; Service Cost: 152.25; Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: City of Torrance (Plaintiff); As to: Sammy Sinsay Saria (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: City of Torrance (Plaintiff); As to: Sammy Sinsay Saria (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: City of Torrance (Plaintiff); As to: Sammy Sinsay Saria (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: City of Torrance (Plaintiff); As to: Sammy Sinsay Saria (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/02/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF TORRANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOLL JEFF