This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/19/2023 at 06:30:37 (UTC).

CITY OF TORRANCE VS RAUL SALINAS FLORES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/01/2023 CITY OF TORRANCE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RAUL SALINAS FLORES,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0600

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF TORRANCE

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 50

SALINAS FLORES RAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOLL JEFF

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET ADDENDUM

3/1/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET ADDENDUM

Complaint - COMPLAINT - MOTOR VEHICLE

3/1/2023: Complaint - COMPLAINT - MOTOR VEHICLE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/1/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/1/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/3/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2023
  • Hearing08/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketComplaint - Motor Vehicle; Filed by: City of Torrance (Plaintiff); As to: Raul Salinas Flores (Defendant); DOES 1 TO 50 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet and Civil Case Coversheet Addendum; Filed by: City of Torrance (Plaintiff); As to: Raul Salinas Flores (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Filed by: City of Torrance (Plaintiff); As to: Raul Salinas Flores (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less