This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2023 at 07:05:39 (UTC).

CITY OF SANTA MONICA VS ALVIN SOLOMON, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 CITY OF SANTA MONICA filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against ALVIN SOLOMON, AN INDIVIDUAL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is H. JAY FORD III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2430

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

H. JAY FORD III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF SANTA MONICA

Defendants

MARTIN AN INDIVIDUAL WALBERTO

SOLOMON AN INDIVIDUAL ALVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

M RINDELS AUTUMN

Defendant Attorney

KLASKIN HAROLD CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Motion re: - MOTION RE: MOTION TO STRIKE

7/7/2023: Motion re: - MOTION RE: MOTION TO STRIKE

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

7/7/2023: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF FUTURE COURT DATES

5/31/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF FUTURE COURT DATES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION...)

5/30/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION...)

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)

5/16/2023: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)

Case Management Statement

5/15/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/12/2023: Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

5/5/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Motion re: - MOTION RE: MOTION TO STRIKE

3/17/2023: Motion re: - MOTION RE: MOTION TO STRIKE

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

3/17/2023: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

2/14/2023: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Proof of Personal Service

12/13/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/13/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/29/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/22/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/22/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2024
  • Hearing09/09/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2024
  • Hearing09/03/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2023
  • Hearing11/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2023
  • Hearing11/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 11/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Alvin Solomon, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • DocketMotion re: Motion To Strike; Filed by: Alvin Solomon, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketNotice Notice of Future Court Dates; Filed by: City of Santa Monica (Plaintiff); As to: Alvin Solomon, an Individual (Defendant); Walberto Martin, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: ADR and Discovery scheduled for 11/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 09/03/2024 at 09:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: City of Santa Monica (Plaintiff); As to: Walberto Martin, an Individual (Defendant); Service Date: 12/11/2022; Service Cost: 135.92; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: City of Santa Monica (Plaintiff); As to: Alvin Solomon, an Individual (Defendant); Service Date: 12/12/2022; Service Cost: 205.68; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. H. Jay Ford III in Department O Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: City of Santa Monica (Plaintiff); As to: Alvin Solomon, an Individual (Defendant); Walberto Martin, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: City of Santa Monica (Plaintiff); As to: Alvin Solomon, an Individual (Defendant); Walberto Martin, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: City of Santa Monica (Plaintiff); As to: Alvin Solomon, an Individual (Defendant); Walberto Martin, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less