Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/27/2021 at 20:39:55 (UTC).

CITY OF SANTA FE SPRINGS, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL CORPORATION VS SFS HOSPITALITY, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 CITY OF SANTA FE SPRINGS, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SFS HOSPITALITY, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3264

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CITY OF SANTA FE SPRINGS A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

CITY OF SANTA FE SPRINGS

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SFS HOSPITALITY LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SFS HOSPITALITY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINDSAY BRUCE A.

Defendant Attorney

MALINGAGIO PAUL S.

 

Court Documents

Answer

2/10/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

1/4/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/8/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/11/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

1/25/2021: Notice of Ruling

Cross-Complaint

11/12/2020: Cross-Complaint

Answer

11/12/2020: Answer

Amended Complaint - 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/13/2020: Amended Complaint - 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/25/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

9/30/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/31/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/31/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/31/2020: Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • Hearing11/29/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 15 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • Hearing11/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 15 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Santa Fe Springs (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by City of Santa Fe Springs (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by SFS Hospitality, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by SFS Hospitality, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by City of Santa Fe Springs (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketAnswer (to First Amended Complaint); Filed by SFS Hospitality, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by SFS Hospitality, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint ((1st)); Filed by City of Santa Fe Springs (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of Santa Fe Springs (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by City of Santa Fe Springs (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by City of Santa Fe Springs (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by City of Santa Fe Springs (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF SANTA FE SPRINGS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MALINGAGIO PAUL SEBASTIAN