This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/14/2022 at 12:53:28 (UTC).

CITY OF REDONDO BEACH, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION VS STATE WATER RESOURCES CONTROL BOARD

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 CITY OF REDONDO BEACH, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against STATE WATER RESOURCES CONTROL BOARD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3809

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CITY OF REDONDO BEACH A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Defendant

STATE WATER RESOURCES CONTROL BOARD

Interested Parties

1112 INVESTMENT COMPANY LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

1650 VETERAN LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

505 INVESTMENT COMPANY LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

5TH STREET INVESTMENT COMPANY LLC. A CALIFORNIAN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

9300 WILSHIRE FEE LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

9300 WILSHIRE LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

AES REDONDO BEACH LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BK KARKA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DROMY DAVID

ED FLORES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

NEW COMMUE DTLA LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

OUTDOOR BILLBOARD COMPANY LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

PEAK ALCOTT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SLH FUND LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BOND LISA

 

Court Documents

Petition for Writ of Mandate

11/18/2021: Petition for Writ of Mandate

Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

11/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

Request for Dismissal

3/1/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

3/1/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT TO APPEAR REMOTELY AT HEARING

2/24/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT TO APPEAR REMOTELY AT HEARING

Request - REQUEST FOR HEARING PURSUANT TO PUBLIC RESOURCES CODE SECTION 21167.4

12/16/2021: Request - REQUEST FOR HEARING PURSUANT TO PUBLIC RESOURCES CODE SECTION 21167.4

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

12/10/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE ASSIGNMENT OF CEQA CASE

12/6/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE ASSIGNMENT OF CEQA CASE

Notice - NOTICE OF PETITIONER'S ELECTION TO PREPARE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD/RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS

12/6/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF PETITIONER'S ELECTION TO PREPARE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD/RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS

Notice of Related Case

12/6/2021: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

12/1/2021: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ASSIGNMENT OF A CEQA CASE)

11/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ASSIGNMENT OF A CEQA CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE ASSIGNMENT OF A CEQA CASE) OF 11/22/2021

11/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE ASSIGNMENT OF A CEQA CASE) OF 11/22/2021

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 86; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by City of Redondo Beach, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by City of Redondo Beach, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Requirement to Appear Remotely at Hearing); Filed by City of Redondo Beach, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketRequest (for Hearing Pursuant to Public Resources Code Section 21167.4); Filed by City of Redondo Beach, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Trial Setting Conference); Filed by City of Redondo Beach, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF PETITIONER'S ELECTION TO PREPARE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD/RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS); Filed by City of Redondo Beach, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by City of Redondo Beach, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF COURT ORDER RE ASSIGNMENT OF CEQA CASE); Filed by City of Redondo Beach, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 1, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Assignment of a CEQA Case)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Assignment of a CEQA Case) of 11/22/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by City of Redondo Beach, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate; Filed by City of Redondo Beach, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by City of Redondo Beach, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 9300 WILSHIRE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SLH FUND LLC is a litigant