This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2022 at 20:50:55 (UTC).

CITY OF REDONDO BEACH, A CALIFORNIA CHARTER CITY, ET AL. VS ROB BONTA, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS CALIFORNIA ATTORNEY-GENERAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/29/2022 CITY OF REDONDO BEACH, A CALIFORNIA CHARTER CITY filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against ROB BONTA, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS CALIFORNIA ATTORNEY-GENERAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1143

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

CITY OF CARSON A CALIFORNIA CHARTER CITY

CITY OF REDONDO BEACH A CALIFORNIA CHARTER CITY

CITY OF TORRANCE A CALIFORNIA CHARTER CITY

CITY OF WHITTIER A CALIFORNIA CHARTER CITY

Respondents

ROB BONTA IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS CALIFORNIA ATTORNEY-GENERAL

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SOLTANI SUNNY K

Respondent Attorney

MEYERHOFF ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

3/30/2022: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition for Writ of Mandate

3/29/2022: Petition for Writ of Mandate

Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

3/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/29/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Proof of Personal Service

6/1/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/1/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

6/22/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2022
  • Hearing07/12/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 82 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ROB BONTA, in his official capacity as California Attorney-General (Respondent); STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CITY OF REDONDO BEACH, a California charter city (Petitioner); CITY OF CARSON, a California charter city (Petitioner); CITY OF TORRANCE, a California charter city (Petitioner) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CITY OF REDONDO BEACH, a California charter city (Petitioner); CITY OF CARSON, a California charter city (Petitioner); CITY OF TORRANCE, a California charter city (Petitioner) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CITY OF REDONDO BEACH, a California charter city (Petitioner); CITY OF CARSON, a California charter city (Petitioner); CITY OF TORRANCE, a California charter city (Petitioner) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by CITY OF REDONDO BEACH, a California charter city (Petitioner); CITY OF CARSON, a California charter city (Petitioner); CITY OF TORRANCE, a California charter city (Petitioner) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate; Filed by CITY OF REDONDO BEACH, a California charter city (Petitioner); CITY OF CARSON, a California charter city (Petitioner); CITY OF TORRANCE, a California charter city (Petitioner) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF WHITTIER A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF CARSON A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF REDONDO BEACH is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF TORRANCE is a litigant