This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/12/2022 at 10:12:08 (UTC).

CITY OF PALMDALE, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION VS WILL CLARK, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 CITY OF PALMDALE, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against WILL CLARK,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WENDY CHANG and MICHAEL C. KELLEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0121

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WENDY CHANG

MICHAEL C. KELLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF PALMDALE A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Defendants

STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD

STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT

COUNTY OF SAN DIEGO

CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION

RIVERSIDE COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES

LOS ANGELES COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

CLARK MARY KATHERINE

SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY DISTICT ATTORNEY FAMILY SUPPORT BUREAU

BUSHIDO MARTIAL ARTS SUPPLIES. INC. A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

CLARK WILL

LOS ANGELES COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES

CLARK DOROTHY NELL

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION

UNITED STUDIOS OF SELF DEFENSE INC. A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

CLARK MICHELLE

CLARK CLAIRE

MATTERA CHARLES

ORANGE COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY FAMILY SUPPORT DIVISION

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AMSPOKER TODD A

STONE JEREMY DAVID

Defendant Attorneys

COLLINS SUSAN

HALABI TALIN

IZQUIETA RENATO

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION

4/28/2022: Order - ORDER FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION

Order - ORDER DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN EMINENT DOMAIN

4/28/2022: Order - ORDER DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN EMINENT DOMAIN

Default Judgment

4/28/2022: Default Judgment

Order - ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

4/28/2022: Order - ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Proof of Publication

12/28/2021: Proof of Publication

Disclaimer

1/14/2022: Disclaimer

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/28/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/1/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Publication

2/2/2022: Proof of Publication

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/10/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

3/18/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

3/21/2022: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

3/29/2022: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GUILLERMO PADILLA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

3/30/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GUILLERMO PADILLA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TERENCE M. CONNOLLY, MAI, ASA, AI-GRS, IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

3/30/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TERENCE M. CONNOLLY, MAI, ASA, AI-GRS, IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEREMY D. STONE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

3/30/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEREMY D. STONE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Application - APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

3/30/2022: Application - APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

97 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered on the Complaint filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation on 02/19/2021 as follows: Plaintiff to take nothing by virtue of the complaint.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation against Defendant WILL CLARK, Defendant CLAIRE CLARK, Defendant STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD, Defendant MARY KATHERINE CLARK, Defendant DOROTHY NELL CLARK, Defendant MICHELLE CLARK, Defendant KIMBERLY CLARK, Defendant SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION, Defendant CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, a national banking association, Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, Defendant RIVERSIDE COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES and Defendant BUSHIDO MARTIAL ARTS SUPPLIES. INC. a limited liability corporation on the Complaint filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation on 02/19/2021 for a total of $0.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff); As to: The heirs and devisees of Will Clark, deceased, and all persons claiming by, through, or under said decedent Erroneously Sued As WILL CLARK (Defendant); The heirs and devisees of Claire Clark, deceased, and all persons claiming by, through, or under said decedent Erroneously Sued As CLAIRE CLARK (Defendant); STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to WILL CLARK; CLAIRE CLARK; STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD et al. On the Complaint filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation on 02/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketOrder Granting Application for Default Judgment; Signed and Filed by: City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff); As to: The heirs and devisees of Will Clark, deceased, and all persons claiming by, through, or under said decedent Erroneously Sued As WILL CLARK (Defendant); The heirs and devisees of Claire Clark, deceased, and all persons claiming by, through, or under said decedent Erroneously Sued As CLAIRE CLARK (Defendant); STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Order Granting Application for Default Judgment: Filed By: City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 04/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketOrder Final Order of Condemnation; Signed and Filed by: City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff); As to: The heirs and devisees of Will Clark, deceased, and all persons claiming by, through, or under said decedent Erroneously Sued As WILL CLARK (Defendant); The heirs and devisees of Claire Clark, deceased, and all persons claiming by, through, or under said decedent Erroneously Sued As CLAIRE CLARK (Defendant); STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Order Final Order of Condemnation: Filed By: City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 04/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
146 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff); As to: MICHELLE CLARK (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) DOE 1: Name Extension: DOE 1; As To Parties changed from Los Angeles County Department of Treasurer and Tax Collector (Defendant) to Los Angeles County Department of Treasurer and Tax Collector (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County Department of Treasurer and Tax Collector (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department A15 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff); As to: WILL CLARK (Defendant); CLAIRE CLARK (Defendant); STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff); As to: WILL CLARK (Defendant); CLAIRE CLARK (Defendant); STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice Notice of Pendency of action; Filed by: City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff); As to: WILL CLARK (Defendant); CLAIRE CLARK (Defendant); STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff); As to: WILL CLARK (Defendant); CLAIRE CLARK (Defendant); STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED STUDIOS OF SELF DEFENSE NEVADA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Orange County District Attorney is a litigant