This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/18/2020 at 04:22:19 (UTC).

CITY OF PALMDALE, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION VS STOR-ALL, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/03/2020 CITY OF PALMDALE, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against STOR-ALL, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0249

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF PALMDALE A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Defendant

STOR-ALL A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMSPOKER TODD ADAMS

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

4/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/3/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

4/3/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/3/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

4/3/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • Hearing07/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Pendency of Action); Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.