This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/19/2021 at 09:16:09 (UTC).

CITY OF PALMDALE, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION VS RUBEN J. GUERRA, SR., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/31/2020 CITY OF PALMDALE, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against RUBEN J GUERRA, SR . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0527

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF PALMDALE A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Defendants

PALMDALE COMMUNITY REDEVELOPMENT AGENCY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GUERRA-SANTORU ALMA G.

WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SANTORU JOSEPH

LOS ANGELES COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK F.A

COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LOS ANGELES COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES

GUERRA RUBEN J. SR.

BOYLE TONISHIA

MILLER RICHARD A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMSPOKER TODD ADAMS

Defendant Attorneys

HARRIS SETH

HALABI TALIN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

1/25/2021: Request for Dismissal

Declaration - DECLARATION OF EMILY B. HARRINGTON RE SERVICE, ETC.

2/10/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF EMILY B. HARRINGTON RE SERVICE, ETC.

Judgment - JUDGMENT STIPULATED JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION

2/23/2021: Judgment - JUDGMENT STIPULATED JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION

Order - ORDER FINAL ORDER FOR CONDEMNATION

2/23/2021: Order - ORDER FINAL ORDER FOR CONDEMNATION

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDERS

3/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDERS

Case Management Statement

1/8/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/10/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Other - - ORDER STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT IN CONDEMANTION AND FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION

11/30/2020: Other - - ORDER STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT IN CONDEMANTION AND FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION

Disclaimer

11/24/2020: Disclaimer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

11/12/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/30/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/30/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/30/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/30/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/30/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/30/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Orders); Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketJudgment (Stipulated Judgment in Condemnation); Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketOrder (Final Order for Condemnation); Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Emily B. Harrington re Service, etc.); Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Does 1-25); Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Continued Case Management Conference); Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Washington Mutual Bank, F.A (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketDisclaimer; Filed by Washington Mutual Bank, F.A (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketDisclaimer; Filed by Los Angeles County Department of Child Support Services (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Pendency of Action); Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF PALMDALE A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Washington Mutual Bank is a litigant