This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2020 at 21:09:02 (UTC).

CITY OF PALMDALE, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION VS RUBEN CORTES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/03/2020 CITY OF PALMDALE, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against RUBEN CORTES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0245

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF PALMDALE A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Defendants

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES

FRANCHISE TAX BOARD

FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY A FLORIDA CORPORATION

CORTES RUBEN

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION

CORTES OLGA

WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMSPOKER TODD ADAMS

Defendant Attorneys

TRACHTENBERG JORDAN

LE DONNY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/11/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

5/11/2020: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

5/11/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

5/11/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

5/11/2020: Request for Dismissal

Disclaimer - DISCLAIMER OF STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD IN RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN

4/24/2020: Disclaimer - DISCLAIMER OF STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD IN RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN

Declaration re: Due Diligence

4/21/2020: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Personal Service

4/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/21/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration re: Due Diligence

4/21/2020: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Disclaimer - DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN

4/10/2020: Disclaimer - DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IN EMINENT DOMAIN

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/3/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

4/3/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/3/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • Hearing07/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketDisclaimer (of State of California Franchise Tax Board in Response to Complaint in Eminent Domain); Filed by Franchise Tax Board (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketDisclaimer (of Interest in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint in Eminent Domain); Filed by Fidelity National Title Insurance Company, a Florida corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Pendency of Action); Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.