This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2020 at 15:26:48 (UTC).

CITY OF PALMDALE, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION VS NABEEL HAWARA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/03/2020 CITY OF PALMDALE, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against NABEEL HAWARA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0246

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF PALMDALE A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Defendants

JONATHAN FINANCIAL CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CHIMAYAN MHER

HAWARA NABEEL

LOS ANGELES COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMSPOKER TODD ADAMS

Defendant Attorney

WEBER JEFFERY

 

Court Documents

Answer

5/20/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

5/11/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/11/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/3/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

4/3/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/3/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

4/3/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • Hearing07/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Nabeel Hawara (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Pendency of Action); Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.