This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/23/2022 at 16:47:46 (UTC).

CITY OF PALMDALE, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION VS MYRON G. LARKIN, SR., TRUSTEE OF THE LARKIN FAMILY TRUST, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/03/2020 CITY OF PALMDALE, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against MYRON G LARKIN, SR , TRUSTEE OF THE LARKIN FAMILY TRUST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0535

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF PALMDALE A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Defendants

MYRON G. LARKIN SR. TRUSTEE OF THE LARKIN FAMILY TRUST

SHANKAR NALINI

NALINI S. BHATTA TRUSTEE OF THE RESTATED BHATTA REVOCABLE FAMILY TRUST

LAWRENCE RICHARD

SHANKAR A. BHATTA TRUSTEE OF THE RESTATED BHATTA REVOCABLE FAMILY TRUST

GRANDPOINT BANK

LOS ANGELES COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

JONATHON FINANCIAL CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BOFI FEDERAL BANK

GEETHA R. MADHAVAN TRUSTEE OF THE MADHAVAN FAMILY TRUST

LAWRENCE LINDA

SETHU V. MADHAVAN TRUSTEE OF THE MADHAVAN FAMILY TRUST

MADHAVAN SETHU V.

SHANKAR HERLANE

FIRST AMERICAN MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO T.D SERVICE COMPANY

MADHAVAN GEETHA R.

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

PATRICIA A. LOPES AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE GILBERT AND PATRICIA LOPES 1990 TRUST

SHANKAR NALINI AKA NALINI S. BHATTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZICK RYAN D.

AMSPOKER TODD ADAMS

Defendant Attorneys

STARRETT AMY ELIZABETH

HALABI TALIN

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION

1/3/2022: Order - ORDER FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION

Order - ORDER STIPULATED JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION

1/3/2022: Order - ORDER STIPULATED JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT J...)

1/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT J...)

Order - ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR: (1) DEFAULT JUDGMENT; AND (2) REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION

1/3/2022: Order - ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR: (1) DEFAULT JUDGMENT; AND (2) REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Application - APPLICATION FOR: (1) DEFAULT JUDGMENT; AND (2) REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION

12/3/2021: Application - APPLICATION FOR: (1) DEFAULT JUDGMENT; AND (2) REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MYRON G. LARKIN, SR. IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION FOR :(1) DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND (2) REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION

12/3/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MYRON G. LARKIN, SR. IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION FOR :(1) DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND (2) REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF LYNN GLIDDEN IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR: (1) DEFAULT JUDGMENT; AND (2) REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION

12/3/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF LYNN GLIDDEN IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR: (1) DEFAULT JUDGMENT; AND (2) REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RYAN D. ZICK IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR: (1) DEFAULT JUDGMENT; AND (2) REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION

12/3/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RYAN D. ZICK IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR: (1) DEFAULT JUDGMENT; AND (2) REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION AND FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION

12/3/2021: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION AND FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION

Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE - NO SERVICE

12/3/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE - NO SERVICE

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

9/22/2021: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

9/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

9/7/2021: Case Management Statement

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

6/14/2021: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

Proof of Publication

6/15/2021: Proof of Publication

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/23/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default Judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketOrder (Stipulated Judgment in Condemnation); Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketOrder (Final Order of Condemnation); Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Default J...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketOrder (Granting Application for: (1) Default Judgment; and (2) Request for Entry of Stipulated Judgment in Condemnation); Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (for Judgment in Condemnation and Final Order of Condemnation); Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketApplication (for: (1) Default Judgment; and (2) Request for Entry of Stipulated Judgment in Condemnation); Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Ryan D. Zick in Support of Application for: (1) Default Judgment; and (2) Request for Entry of Stipulated Judgment in Condemnation); Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Myron G. Larkin, Sr. in Support of Notice of Application and Application for :(1) Default Judgment and (2) Request for Entry of Stipulated Judgment in Condemnation); Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketDisclaimer (of Interest); Filed by First American Mortgage Solutions, LLC, a Delaware limited liability corporation as successor in interest to T.D Service Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Los Angeles County Tax Collector (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketDisclaimer; Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Pendency of Action); Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRANDPOINT BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where BOFI FEDERAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where JONATHAN FINANCIAL CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRST AMERICAN MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS LLC is a litigant