Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/09/2021 at 11:07:17 (UTC).

CITY OF PALMDALE, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION VS MAX YANG, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 CITY OF PALMDALE, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against MAX YANG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0871

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF PALMDALE A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Defendants

YANG MAX

CENTURY CITY MALL LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

TAX COLLECTOR OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY

PONTIS CAPITAL LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC. A CORPORATION DBA CONTINENTAL COMMERCIAL GROUP

ANAVERDE MASTER ASSOCIATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MONROVIA-MYRTLE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

PAKE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMSPOKER TODD ADAMS

Defendant Attorneys

COLLINS SUSAN

GREENE GAVIN LIAM

ROSENBAUM MARK J.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

2/10/2020: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER REGARDING STATUS OF COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES TAX LIENS

1/21/2020: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER REGARDING STATUS OF COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES TAX LIENS

Answer

1/16/2020: Answer

Disclaimer - DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE

1/16/2020: Disclaimer - DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF MAILING (SUBSTITUTED SERVICE)

1/13/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF MAILING (SUBSTITUTED SERVICE)

Declaration re: Due Diligence

1/8/2020: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Declaration re: Due Diligence

1/8/2020: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Personal Service

1/8/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

1/8/2020: Answer

Disclaimer

1/9/2020: Disclaimer

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

12/17/2019: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

12/17/2019: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

12/17/2019: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY

12/18/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY

Proof of Personal Service

12/12/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/2/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/21/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/21/2019: Complaint

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (Regarding Status of County of Los Angeles Tax Liens); Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Monrovia-Myrtle, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketDisclaimer; Filed by United States of America (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketDisclaimer (of Interest in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint for Foreclosure); Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service ((Served U.S. Attorney's Office)); Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketDisclaimer (of Interest in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint for Foreclosure); Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Tax Collector of Los Angeles County (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by City of Palmdale, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONROVIA-MYRTLE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where PAKE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ANAVERDE MASTER ASSOCIATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTURY CITY MALL LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant