This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2022 at 05:51:05 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES VS STEVE SUNGHO LEE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 CITY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STEVE SUNGHO LEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5906

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Defendants

BIO HAZARD INC.

GREEN BUDDAH LLC

L & H LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

L&HM LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

LAKHANY RAHEELA

LEE STEVE SUNGHO

SATTAR SHAFAQ ASLAM

SL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT I LLC.

SL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT II LLC

SMOKE TOKES LLC

ST & COMPANY LLC

STELEE INDUSTRIES INC.

VO MINH V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEELHEAD AMELIA

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/12/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

5/12/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

5/12/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

5/12/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/12/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/12/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

5/12/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/12/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

5/12/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

7/14/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/14/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/14/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/14/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/14/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/14/2022: Proof of Personal Service

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2025
  • Hearing05/08/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2023
  • Hearing11/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2023
  • Hearing10/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by City of Los Angeles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STELEE INDUSTRIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where L & H LIMITED PARTNERSHIP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant