Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 01:28:51 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES VS PATRICIA E O'BRIEN

Case Summary

On 09/28/2018 CITY OF LOS ANGELES filed an Other lawsuit against PATRICIA E O'BRIEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3669

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

O'BRIEN PATRICIA E.

LATA AHIR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

FEUER MICHAEL N. CITY ATTORNEY

CIFARELLI THOMAS ABITABILE

FEUER MICHAEL NELSON

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/25/2019: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

1/7/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

1/17/2019: Minute Order

Proof of Personal Service

11/5/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order

12/7/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/28/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/24/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/24/2018: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

5/7/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

COMPLAINT

9/28/2018: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

9/28/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

SUMMONS

9/28/2018: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEUER MICHAEL N. CITY ATTORNEY