This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/06/2018 at 10:16:01 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES VS MECHELLE VINAS TABOR ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 CITY OF LOS ANGELES filed an Other lawsuit against MECHELLE VINAS TABOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2328

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 20

TABOR MECHELLE VINAS

THE POT SHOP

JOSEPH CHAD DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FEUER MICHAEL N. CITY ATTORNEY

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

3/1/2017: SUMMONS

Unknown

3/3/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/3/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DILIGENCE REPORT

4/20/2017: DILIGENCE REPORT

DILIGENCE REPORT

4/20/2017: DILIGENCE REPORT

DILIGENCE REPORT

5/2/2017: DILIGENCE REPORT

DILIGENCE REPORT

5/2/2017: DILIGENCE REPORT

MINUTE ORDER

5/2/2017: MINUTE ORDER

DILIGENCE REPORT

5/2/2017: DILIGENCE REPORT

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

6/9/2017: DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

6/9/2017: DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/28/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

6/30/2017: Minute Order

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other (DILIGENCE ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other (DILIGENCE REPORT ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; OSC - No Return of Service - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other (FILED (3) DILIGENCE REPORT ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other ((DILIGENCE REPORT) (2) ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC652328    Hearing Date: February 07, 2020    Dept: 32

Cindy Tolhurst v. Megumi Nakamura

Case No. BC652328

The hearing on this motion is continued to Friday, February 21, 2020, at 1:30 p.m.