This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2019 at 02:50:24 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES VS MARCIN LAMBIRTH LLP

Case Summary

On 06/27/2018 CITY OF LOS ANGELES filed an Other lawsuit against MARCIN LAMBIRTH LLP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1803

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Defendant

MARCIN LAMBIRTH LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DUE ON UNPAID BUSINESS TAX ASSESSMENTS

6/27/2018: COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DUE ON UNPAID BUSINESS TAX ASSESSMENTS

SUMMONS

6/27/2018: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/10/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

7/10/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Minute Order

8/28/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/28/2018: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69; (OSC - No Return of Service; Discharged) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by City Of Los Angeles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MONEY DUE ON UNPAID BUSINESS TAX ASSESSMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARCIN LAMBIRTH LLP is a litigant