This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/05/2018 at 16:28:52 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES VS MARCIN LAMBIRTH LLP

Case Summary

On 11/17/2017 CITY OF LOS ANGELES filed an Other lawsuit against MARCIN LAMBIRTH LLP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4041

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 TO 20

MARCIN LAMBIRTH LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

FEUER MICHAEL N. CITY ATTORNEY

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DUE ON UNPAID BUSINESS TAX ASSESSMENTS

11/17/2017: COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DUE ON UNPAID BUSINESS TAX ASSESSMENTS

SUMMONS

11/17/2017: SUMMONS

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

11/30/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/30/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

1/8/2018: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; OSC - No Return of Service - Case Dismissed/Disposed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARCIN LAMBIRTH LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEUER MICHAEL N. CITY ATTORNEY