This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/15/2019 at 13:00:52 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES VS ENGSTROM LIPSCOMB AND LACK

Case Summary

On 10/27/2017 CITY OF LOS ANGELES filed an Other lawsuit against ENGSTROM LIPSCOMB AND LACK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1077

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

ENGSTROM LIPSCOMB AND LACK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

OROZCO FRANK JR. DEPUTY CITY ATTORNEY

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LACK WALTER J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Unknown

2/6/2018: Unknown

DEFENDANT ENGSTROM, LIPSCOMB & LACK'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

2/6/2018: DEFENDANT ENGSTROM, LIPSCOMB & LACK'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Unknown

2/7/2018: Unknown

Unknown

2/22/2018: Unknown

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

2/22/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Minute Order

7/17/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE RULING

7/17/2018: NOTICE OF POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE RULING

Minute Order

7/17/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/25/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING

8/24/2018: NOTICE OF RULING

Minute Order

8/31/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT

9/6/2018: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT

DEFENDANT ENGSTROM LIPSCOMB & LACK'S ANSWER TO PIAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

1/16/2018: DEFENDANT ENGSTROM LIPSCOMB & LACK'S ANSWER TO PIAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

11/30/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

Unknown

11/6/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/6/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS

10/27/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DUE ON UNPAID BUSINESS TAX ASSESSMENT

10/27/2017: COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DUE ON UNPAID BUSINESS TAX ASSESSMENT

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 69; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-09-28 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 69; Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-08-31 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • NOTICE OF RULING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 69; Ex-Parte Proceedings (Exparte proceeding; Denied without prejudice) -

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DUE ON UNPAID BUSINESS TAX ASSESSMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENGSTROM LIPSCOMB AND LACK is a litigant