This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 04:25:15 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES VS DYANA BRITTENUM ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/25/2017 CITY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DYANA BRITTENUM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0009

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

Respondents and Defendants

MILLER SEMAJ

BRITTENUM DYANA

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

SHERWIN DENNIS J. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorney

SHERRON ALVIN B.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR SUBROGATION OF WORKERS' COMPENSATION BENEFITS PAID

7/25/2017: COMPLAINT FOR SUBROGATION OF WORKERS' COMPENSATION BENEFITS PAID

SUMMONS

7/25/2017: SUMMONS

Minute Order

6/7/2019: Minute Order

Order Granting Attorney"s Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

6/7/2019: Order Granting Attorney"s Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

5/9/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration

5/9/2019: Declaration

Affidavit

1/17/2019: Affidavit

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/17/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Ruling

1/8/2019: Notice of Ruling

Ex Parte Application

1/8/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

1/8/2019: Minute Order

Stipulation

1/8/2019: Stipulation

Declaration

1/8/2019: Declaration

Affidavit

11/29/2018: Affidavit

Notice

11/9/2018: Notice

Affidavit

11/8/2018: Affidavit

Answer

11/2/2018: Answer

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (by Attorney Alvin B. Sherron as to Defendant Dyana Brittenum) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Dyana Brittenum (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel by Attorney Alvin...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel-Civil); Filed by Dyana Brittenum (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Dyana Brittenum (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketAffidavit (Amended Affidavit of Service re Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint of Defendant, Semaj Miller); Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (- Plaintiff City of Los Angeles' Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and all Trial Related Dates) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketDeclaration of Marcus S. Loo in Support of Plaintiff City of Los Angeles' Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and all Trial Related Dates; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketStipulation to Continue Trial and all Trial Related Dates; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Final Status Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application - Pl...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketAffidavit Of Service Re: Proof Of Service Of Summons And Complaint Of Defendant, Semaj Miller; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Notice of Unavailability

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketAffidavit (of Service re: Proof of Service of Defendant Dyana Brittenum); Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketDefendant Dyana Brittenum's Answer to Complaint for Damages; Filed by Dyana Brittenum (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR SUBROGATION OF WORKERS' COMPENSATION BENEFITS PAID

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****0009    Hearing Date: July 16, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

city of los angeles,

Plaintiff,

v.

dyana brittenum, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: ****0009

Hearing Date: July 16, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to deem admitted

NOTICE

Judge Goorvitch was sworn-in as a Superior Court Judge on December 15, 2015.  Prior to that time, Judge Goorvitch made the following campaign contributions to Michael N. Feuer: (1) $100 to Mr. Feuer’s 2008 campaign for the 42nd Assembly District on or about November 9, 2007; (2) $100 to Mr. Feuer’s 2010 campaign for the 42nd Assembly District on or about October 19, 2010; and (3) $100 to Mr. Feuer’s 2013 campaign for Los Angeles City Attorney on or about May 30, 2012.  Judge Goorvitch has no personal relationship with Mr. Feuer and has had no communications with Mr. Feuer since he became the City Attorney.  The Court can be fair and impartial in this matter.

TENTATIVE ORDER

Plaintiff City of Los Angeles (“Plaintiff”) moves to deem admitted the matters specified in Requests for Admissions, Set One (“RFAs”) served upon Dyana Brittenum (“Defendant”). Where a party fails to respond to requests for admissions, the propounding party may move for an order that the genuineness of any documents and the truth of any matters specified in the requests be deemed admitted, as well as for a monetary sanction. (Code of Civ. Proc., ; 2033.280, subd. (b).) The court “shall” grant a motion to deem admitted the matters specified in the requests for admissions, “unless it finds that the party to whom the requests for admission have been directed has served, before the hearing on the motion, a proposed response to the requests for admission that is in substantial compliance with Section 2033.220.” (Code of Civ. Proc., ; 2033.280, subd. (c).)

Plaintiff served the RFAs on Defendant by mail on November 18, 2019. Defendant’s responses were thus due no later than December 23, 2019. As of the filing date of this motion, Plaintiff has not received responses from Defendant. Defendant has not opposed the motion, and there is nothing in the record to suggest that Defendant has complied with her discovery obligations. Therefore, the motion is granted.

Plaintiff seeks sanctions against Defendant in the amount of $1,110 in the notice, and in the amount of $1,460 in the memorandum of points and authorities. The Court concludes that Defendant’s failure to respond to the discovery is an abuse of the discovery process, warranting sanctions. The Court imposes sanctions against Defendant in the amount of $750, which represents three hours of attorney time at a billing rate of $250 per hour. While Plaintiff requests sanctions for the filing fee, the Court cannot award such sanctions, as Plaintiff is exempt from filing fees.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Defendant is deemed to have admitted the truth of all matters specified in the RFAs as of this date. Defendant shall pay sanctions in the amount of $750 to Plaintiff within thirty (30) days of notice of this order. Plaintiff shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: July 16, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHERWIN DENNIS