This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2019 at 00:26:33 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES VS COLUMBIA SPECIALTY COMPANY INC

Case Summary

On 09/17/2018 CITY OF LOS ANGELES filed an Other lawsuit against COLUMBIA SPECIALTY COMPANY INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1450

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

COLUMBIA SPECIALTY COMPANY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

FEUER MICHAEL N. CITY ATTORNEY

FEUER MICHAEL N.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

9/17/2018: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

9/17/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DUE ON UNPAID BUSINESS TAX ASSESSMENT

9/17/2018: COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DUE ON UNPAID BUSINESS TAX ASSESSMENT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/12/2018: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/12/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

12/26/2018: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

11/26/2018: Minute Order

Proof of Personal Service

11/19/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Mail

1/16/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order

1/11/2019: Minute Order

Request for Dismissal

1/24/2019: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Minute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DUE ON UNPAID BUSINESS TAX ASSESSMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEUER MICHAEL N. CITY ATTORNEY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEUER MICHAEL NELSON