Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2019 at 01:37:21 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES VS AHIR LATA

Case Summary

On 09/28/2018 CITY OF LOS ANGELES filed an Other lawsuit against AHIR LATA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3745

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

LATA AHIR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

FEUER MICHAEL N. CITY ATTORNEY

FEUER MICHAEL N.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (Legacy)

11/5/2018: Proof of Service (Legacy)

Request for Dismissal

1/8/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice

11/5/2018: Notice

Minute Order

12/7/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/24/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/24/2018: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DUE ON UNPAID TRANSIENT OCCUPANCY TAX ASSESSMENT(S)

9/28/2018: COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DUE ON UNPAID TRANSIENT OCCUPANCY TAX ASSESSMENT(S)

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE - IC

9/28/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE - IC

SUMMONS

9/28/2018: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Proof of Service (Legacy) (by personal service); Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Notice (of Order to Show Cause and Case Management Conference); Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE - IC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DUE ON UNPAID TRANSIENT OCCUPANCY TAX ASSESSMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEUER MICHAEL N. CITY ATTORNEY