This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2022 at 07:16:48 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER VS SUKANYA NORTHUP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SUKANYA NORTHUP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0645

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF LOS ANGELES ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER

Defendants

NORTHUP SUKANYA AKA SUKANYA DEWSBERRY AKA SUKANYA DEWSBERRY

VALADEZ DANIELLE NICOLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JERRY BAIK C.

BAIK JERRY C.

Defendant Attorney

SANCHEZ BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT)

4/11/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATED SETTLEMENT AND ORDER

4/12/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATED SETTLEMENT AND ORDER

Notice of Ruling

4/12/2022: Notice of Ruling

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 04/12/2022

4/12/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 04/12/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

4/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

Notice of Ruling

4/14/2022: Notice of Ruling

Request for Dismissal

4/27/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

6/2/2022: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/06/2022

6/6/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/06/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Ruling

6/13/2022: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Settlement

3/2/2022: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

3/7/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/28/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 10/29/2021

10/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 10/29/2021

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 69; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by CITY OF LOS ANGELES, Acting By and Through The LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 69; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • Docketat 3:20 PM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/06/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by CITY OF LOS ANGELES, Acting By and Through The LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by CITY OF LOS ANGELES, Acting By and Through The LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by CITY OF LOS ANGELES, Acting By and Through The LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by CITY OF LOS ANGELES, Acting By and Through The LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Order to Show Cause)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CITY OF LOS ANGELES, Acting By and Through The LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Department 69 Online Courtroom Information); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CITY OF LOS ANGELES, Acting By and Through The LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CITY OF LOS ANGELES, Acting By and Through The LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CITY OF LOS ANGELES, Acting By and Through The LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANCHEZ BRIAN