This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/25/2022 at 03:45:13 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION VS WEST COAST HOME HEALTH CARE, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against WEST COAST HOME HEALTH CARE, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1857

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Respondent

WEST COAST HOME HEALTH CARE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CHUN REGINALD

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

10/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 10/05/2021

10/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 10/05/2021

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/8/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request - REQUEST REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT JUDGMENT

10/25/2021: Request - REQUEST REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT JUDGMENT

Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 585(B) AND CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1800; DECLARATION OF BRADLEY KIRKLAND IN SUPPO

10/25/2021: Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 585(B) AND CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1800; DECLARATION OF BRADLEY KIRKLAND IN SUPPO

Request for Dismissal

10/25/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF'S...)

11/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF'S...)

Default Judgment - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, BY COURT

11/4/2021: Default Judgment - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, BY COURT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF'S...) OF 11/04/2021

11/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF'S...) OF 11/04/2021

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/05/21 HEARING

9/24/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/05/21 HEARING

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/31/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

8/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

6/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition - COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DUE ON UNPAID BUSINESS TAX ASSESSMENTS

6/9/2021: Petition - COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DUE ON UNPAID BUSINESS TAX ASSESSMENTS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

6/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/14/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for counsel for Plaintiff's failure to appear on 10/05/2021) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for counsel for Plaintiff's...) of 11/04/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for counsel for Plaintiff's...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment (by default, by Court); Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketBrief (Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Request for Entry of Court Judgment Pursuant to C.C.P. Section 585(b) and California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1800; Declaration of Bradley Kirkland in Support Thereof); Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketRequest (Request for Entry of Court Judgment); Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Department 69 Online Courtroom Information); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint For Money Due On Unpaid Business Tax Assessments; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHUN REGINALD