Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/03/2020 at 05:48:44 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION VS LEGASSI HOLDINGS, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against LEGASSI HOLDINGS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0867

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Defendant

LEGASSI HOLDINGS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALFORD PETER JONATHAN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/1/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/23/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

6/12/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/08/2020

6/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/08/2020

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/8/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/3/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

6/3/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • Docketat 10:49 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/08/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALFORD PETER JONATHAN