This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/16/2022 at 19:47:07 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION VS GREGG GINSBURG, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2021 CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GREGG GINSBURG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7501

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Defendants

GINSBURG GREGG

GINSBURG SCOTT

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY A TEXAS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DERMER GABRIEL SETH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/3/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/30/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

4/27/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/27/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/11/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • Hearing07/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DERMER GABRIEL S.