This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/09/2019 at 00:21:25 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION VS GENTLECARE TRANSPORT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/28/2019 CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against GENTLECARE TRANSPORT, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7056

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Defendant

GENTLECARE TRANSPORT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEMTOOB PEJMON

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/18/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/14/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/14/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/28/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown

2/28/2019: Unknown

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/28/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

2/28/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Summons

2/28/2019: Summons

Complaint

2/28/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Complaint; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GENTIECARE TRANSPORT INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHEMTOOB PEJMON