This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2021 at 03:40:06 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION VS ARNOLD EDWARD GOLDSTEIN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against ARNOLD EDWARD GOLDSTEIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1606

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Respondents

GOLDSTEIN GURBUZ & ROBERTSON; AN UNKNOWN UNINCORPORATED BUSINESS ENTITY OR PARTNERSHIP

GURBUZ ROBERT B.

GOLDSTEIN ARNOLD EDWARD AKA ARNIE E. GOLDSTEIN

ROBERTSON JOY LYNN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CHUN REGINALD

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/2/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

10/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/29/21 HEARING

9/24/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/29/21 HEARING

Proof of Personal Service

9/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/21/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/21/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

9/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/17/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

9/17/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

8/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/17/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

7/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

5/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/24/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/24/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference 10/29/21 Hearing); Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Department 69 Online Courtroom Information); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint For Money Due On Unpaid Business Tax Assessment; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHUN REGINALD