This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 17:20:55 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION VS AQUILA HEALTHCARE SYSTEMS, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/05/2021 CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against AQUILA HEALTHCARE SYSTEMS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1438

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Respondent

AQUILA HEALTHCARE SYSTEMS LLC DBA TOTAL CARE NURSING SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CHUN REGINALD

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/9/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

11/10/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/10/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

11/12/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/17/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/17/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

11/18/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/22/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

10/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Case Management Statement

10/13/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

9/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Case Management Statement

9/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

8/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Case Management Statement

8/13/2021: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 39 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

5/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 39 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/10/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/10/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • Hearing12/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • Hearing12/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • Hearing12/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Department 69 Online Courtroom Information); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketPetition (Petition Complaint For Money Due On Unpaid Business Tax Assessments); Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AQUILA HEALTHCARE SYSTEMS LLC DBA TOTAL CARE NURSING SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHUN REGINALD