This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/21/2021 at 09:37:02 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION VS 3705 GROUP, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against 3705 GROUP, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1688

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Respondent

3705 GROUP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CHUN REGINALD

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/27/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

5/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Petition - COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DUE ON UNPAID BUSINESS TAX ASSESSMENTS

5/25/2021: Petition - COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DUE ON UNPAID BUSINESS TAX ASSESSMENTS

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

5/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/27/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

8/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Case Management Statement

8/13/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/21/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

9/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Request for Dismissal

10/8/2021: Request for Dismissal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Department 69 Online Courtroom Information); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint For Money Due On Unpaid Business Tax Assessments; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by City of Los Angeles, a municipal corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 3705 GROUP LLC AND DBA SAWYER RESTAURANT AND DBA KETTLE BLACK RESTAURANT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHUN REGINALD