This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 15:07:47 (UTC).

CITY OF LAWNDALE, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION VS CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (CALTRANS), A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/08/2020 CITY OF LAWNDALE, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION CALTRANS , A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SAMANTHA JESSNER, RICHARD L. FRUIN and DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2875

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SAMANTHA JESSNER

RICHARD L. FRUIN

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CITY OF LAWNDALE

Respondents

CALTRANS DISTRICT 7

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION CALTRANS

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY A PUBLIC ENTITY

SOUTH BAY CITIES COUNCIL OF GOVERNMENTS A JOINT POWERS AUTHORITY

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

SOUTH BAY CITIES COUNCIL OF GOVERNMENTS

Interested Parties

CITY OF EL SEGUNDO A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

CITY OF HAWTHORNE A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

CITY OF TORRANCE A CALIFORNIA CHARTER MUNICIPALITY

CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

CITY OF REDONDO BEACH A CALIFORNIA CHARTER MUNICIPALITY

CITY OF EL SEGUNDO

CITY OF HAWTHORNE

CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH

CITY OF REDONDO BEACH

CITY OF TORRANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LAYMON LONA N.

Respondent Attorney

BERKEBILE MARK A.

Interested Party Attorneys

JENSON M. KATHERINE

SULLIVAN PATRICK Q.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CERTIFICATION OF THE RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS

2/4/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CERTIFICATION OF THE RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL PENDING SETTLEMENT

3/1/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL PENDING SETTLEMENT

Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling

5/18/2021: Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling

Notice of Settlement

5/21/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) [CEQA])

6/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) [CEQA])

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION OVER ENFORCEMENT OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

6/14/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION OVER ENFORCEMENT OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

1/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE C.E.Q.A. CASE)

1/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE C.E.Q.A. CASE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS)

12/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER DISMISSING UNNECESSARY PARTIES

12/7/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER DISMISSING UNNECESSARY PARTIES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW - CLERICAL REVIEW)

11/19/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW - CLERICAL REVIEW)

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO DISMISS UNNECESSARY PARTIES

11/6/2020: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO DISMISS UNNECESSARY PARTIES

Order - ORDER ORDER DISMISSING UNNECESSARY PARTIES

11/12/2020: Order - ORDER ORDER DISMISSING UNNECESSARY PARTIES

Proof of Personal Service

10/20/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CEQA SETTLEMENT MEETING

10/21/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CEQA SETTLEMENT MEETING

Proof of Service by Mail

10/2/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Personal Service

10/2/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/2/2020: Proof of Personal Service

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) ([CEQA]) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (FOR COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION OVER ENFORCEMENT OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT); Filed by City of Lawndale (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) [CEQA])); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (After Settlement) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by City of Lawndale (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Relocation Rescheduling; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial ((C.E.Q.A.)) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL PENDING SETTLEMENT); Filed by City of Lawndale (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CERTIFICATION OF THE RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS); Filed by California Department of Transportation (CALTRANS) (Respondent); Caltrans District 7 (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference (C.E.Q.A. case) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by City of Lawndale (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by City of Lawndale (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 1, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re CEQA Assignment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re CEQA Assignment) of 09/09/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (- Proof of Service of Notice of Intent of the City of Lawndale to File CEQA Petition (Public Resources Code 21167.5)); Filed by City of Lawndale (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketRequest (For Preparation Of Records of Proceedings); Filed by City of Lawndale (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by City of Lawndale (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by City of Lawndale (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate; Filed by City of Lawndale (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF HAWTHORNE is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF REDONDO BEACH is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF EL SEGUNDO is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH is a litigant