This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/06/2023 at 20:39:06 (UTC).

CITY OF LA CANADA FLINTRIDGE, A GENERAL LAW CITY VS JANET LOUISE MCKNIGHT, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 CITY OF LA CANADA FLINTRIDGE, A GENERAL LAW CITY filed an Other lawsuit against JANET LOUISE MCKNIGHT, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID A. ROSEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0067

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID A. ROSEN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CITY OF LA CANADA FLINTRIDGE A GENERAL LAW CITY

Respondent

MCKNIGHT AN INDIVIDUAL JANET LOUISE

Not Classified By Court

BEATTY ERIC P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CASTILLO CAROLINE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Continuance

12/28/2022: Notice of Continuance

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/21/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Status Report

12/21/2022: Status Report

Notice of Continuance

10/13/2022: Notice of Continuance

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/4/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/26/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

7/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Notice - NOTICE OF FILING OF THE RECEIVER'S UNDERTAKING

7/13/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF FILING OF THE RECEIVER'S UNDERTAKING

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/13/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Receiver Bond

7/6/2022: Receiver Bond

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/5/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Oath of Receiver

7/5/2022: Oath of Receiver

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER

6/20/2022: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER ...)

6/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER ...)

Order - ORDER (PROPOSED) ORDER FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER AND RELATED INJUNCTION PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 17980.7, ET SEQ.

6/17/2022: Order - ORDER (PROPOSED) ORDER FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER AND RELATED INJUNCTION PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 17980.7, ET SEQ.

Proof of Personal Service

5/26/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/26/2022: Proof of Personal Service

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2023
  • Hearing03/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge, a general law city (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge, a general law city (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 03/14/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by: Eric P. Beatty (Non-Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Eric P. Beatty (Non-Party); As to: Janet Louise McKnight, an individual (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge, a general law city (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 12/22/2022 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David A. Rosen in Department E Glendale Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketPetition Petition for Appointment of Receiver and Other Relief Pursuant to Health and Safety Code Section 17980.7, et seq. Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge, a general law city (Petitioner); As to: Janet Louise McKnight, an individual (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge, a general law city (Petitioner); As to: Janet Louise McKnight, an individual (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less