This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/01/2023 at 03:49:30 (UTC).

CITY OF HUNTINGTON PARK, A GENERAL CITY VS THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF BARBARA S. BRYM, ALSO KNOW AS BARBARA KULATTI

Case Summary

On 11/02/2022 CITY OF HUNTINGTON PARK, A GENERAL CITY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF BARBARA S BRYM, ALSO KNOW AS BARBARA KULATTI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LEE W. TSAO and OLIVIA ROSALES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1193

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LEE W. TSAO

OLIVIA ROSALES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF HUNTINGTON PARK A GENERAL CITY

Defendant

THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF BARBARA S. BRYM ALSO KNOW AS BARBARA KULATTI

Not Classified By Court

ALSBROOK BLAKE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASTILLO CAROLINE

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION

1/31/2023: Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

1/31/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

Order - ORDER /RULING

1/30/2023: Order - ORDER /RULING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION RE RECEIVER'S CERTIFICATE)

1/30/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION RE RECEIVER'S CERTIFICATE)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION RE RECEIVER'S CERTIFICATE

1/24/2023: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION RE RECEIVER'S CERTIFICATE

Undertaking - UNDERTAKING UNDER SECTION 567(B) C.C.P.

11/18/2022: Undertaking - UNDERTAKING UNDER SECTION 567(B) C.C.P.

Oath of Receiver

11/17/2022: Oath of Receiver

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER AND RELATED INJUNCTION

11/17/2022: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER AND RELATED INJUNCTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER/R...)

11/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER/R...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CODE ENFORCEMENT OFFICER STEPHEN SCHUCH IN SUPPORT OF EXPARTE MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER

11/10/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CODE ENFORCEMENT OFFICER STEPHEN SCHUCH IN SUPPORT OF EXPARTE MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CAROLINE K.CASTILLO RE EXPARTE NOTICE

11/10/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CAROLINE K.CASTILLO RE EXPARTE NOTICE

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOMINATION OF RECEIVER

11/10/2022: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOMINATION OF RECEIVER

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER/RELATED INJUNCTION, OR ALTERNATIVELY ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO FILE AND SERVE THE MOTION; ET AL

11/10/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER/RELATED INJUNCTION, OR ALTERNATIVELY ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO FILE AND SERVE THE MOTION; ET AL

Request for Judicial Notice

11/10/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Complaint

11/2/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/2/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/2/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/2/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2023
  • Hearing03/17/2023 at 2:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketOrder Proposed Order re Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Blake Alsbrook (Non-Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Order Proposed Order re Ex Parte Application: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketNotice Notice of Entry of Order; Filed by: Blake Alsbrook (Non-Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application re Receiver's Certificate: Filed By: Blake Alsbrook (Non-Party); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 01/30/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketOrder /RULING; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application re Receiver's Certificate)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application re Receiver's Certificate scheduled for 01/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department C updated: Result Date to 01/30/2023; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application re Receiver's Certificate scheduled for 01/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketEx Parte Application Ex Parte Application re Receiver's Certificate; Filed by: Blake Alsbrook (Non-Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Judicial Notice: As To Parties: The Testate and Intestate Successors of Barbara S. Brym, also know as Barbara Kulatti (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketNotice PLAINTIFF'S NOMINATION OF RECEIVER; Filed by: City Of Huntington Park, a general City (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketEx Parte Application FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER/RELATED INJUNCTION, OR ALTERNATIVELY ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO FILE AND SERVE THE MOTION; et al; Filed by: City Of Huntington Park, a general City (Plaintiff); As to: The Testate and Intestate Successors of Barbara S. Brym, also know as Barbara Kulatti (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/17/2023 at 02:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: City Of Huntington Park, a general City (Plaintiff); As to: The Testate and Intestate Successors of Barbara S. Brym, also know as Barbara Kulatti (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: City Of Huntington Park, a general City (Plaintiff); As to: The Testate and Intestate Successors of Barbara S. Brym, also know as Barbara Kulatti (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: City Of Huntington Park, a general City (Plaintiff); As to: The Testate and Intestate Successors of Barbara S. Brym, also know as Barbara Kulatti (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Margaret Miller Bernal in Department F Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******1193 Hearing Date: January 30, 2023 Dept: C

TENTATIVE RULING:

City of Huntington Park v. The Testate and Intestate Successors of Barbara S. Brym *******1193

Receiver Blake C. Alsbrook's Ex Parte Application is GRANTED. Moving Party to give notice.