This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/14/2023 at 05:43:15 (UTC).

CITY OF GLENDALE VS MURADYAN, VAHE

Case Summary

On 01/23/2023 CITY OF GLENDALE filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against MURADYAN, VAHE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREENE, VICKI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0083

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREENE, VICKI

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CITY OF GLENDALE

Respondent

MURADYAN VAHE

Other

SEFARIAN MAHIG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KANG EDWARD B

 

Court Documents

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

1/23/2023: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Petition - Workplace Violence (violence)

1/23/2023: Petition - Workplace Violence (violence)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/23/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

1/23/2023: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Proof of Service - Proof of Service

2/14/2023: Proof of Service - Proof of Service

Minute Order

2/15/2023: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

2/15/2023: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

2/15/2023: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2023
  • Hearing03/15/2023 at 8:30 AM in Department S at 300 East Walnut St., Pasadena, CA 91101; Restraining Order Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S, Greene, Vicki, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketPetition - Workplace Violence (violence); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less