This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/11/2019 at 00:48:42 (UTC).

CITY OF GLENDALE VS ASP HOLDINGS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/21/2018 CITY OF GLENDALE filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against ASP HOLDINGS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7005

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

GLENDALE CITY OF

CITY OF GLENDALE

Defendants and Respondents

ASPECT LED

ASP HOLDINGS INC.

DOES 1-50

ASP HOLDINGS INC. DBA ASPECT LED A MINNESOTA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GARCIA MICHAEL J. CITY ATTORNEY

KASDAN LIPPSMITH WEBER TURNER LLP

KASDAN KENNETH S.

GARCIA MICHAEL JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/11/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

6/21/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

6/21/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT

6/29/2018: NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/29/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/29/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

8/13/2018: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

Case Management Statement

10/10/2018: Case Management Statement

Notice of Settlement

10/18/2018: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order

10/25/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/14/2019: Minute Order

Request for Dismissal

2/11/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order

2/20/2019: Minute Order

Notice

2/27/2019: Notice

Notice

2/27/2019: Notice

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

3/6/2019: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

SUMMONS

5/21/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF FOR: 1. BREACH OF FPRESS WARRANTY; ETC

5/21/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF FOR: 1. BREACH OF FPRESS WARRANTY; ETC

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by City of Glendale (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Notice ( of Errata); Filed by City of Glendale (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Notice ( of Entry of Order); Filed by City of Glendale (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 24; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Request for Dismissal (With Prejudice as to Entire Action); Filed by City of Glendale (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Notice ( of Continued Order to Show Cause re Dismissal); Filed by City of Glendale (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 24; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by City of Glendale (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by City of Glendale (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF FOR: 1. BREACH OF FPRESS WARRANTY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

glads 1450

FILED BY FAX

Kenneth S. Kasdan, SBN 71427 EXEMPT FROM FILING FEES Michael D. Turner, SBN 126455 CAL.GOV.CODE, § 6103 Derek J. Scott, SBN 276878

KASDAN L—IPPSMITH WEBER TURNER LLP

19900 MacArthur Boulevard, Suite 850

Trvine},lCalif((gge)l 92612 0: Faxc: (949) 045

Telephone: 851-9000; Fax: (949) 833-9455

mturner@kasdancdlaw.com FILE D dscott@kasdancdlaw.com

Michael J. Garcia, City Attorney (SBN 192848) MAY 21

Ann M. Maurer, Chief Assistant City Attorney (SBN 179649) 2018

613 E. Broadway, Suite 220 . .

Glendale, CA 91206 Sherri R, Carter, Executixe Officer/Cler Telephone: (818) 548-2080 By fl 4!: az Deput Facsimile: (818) 547-3402 Moses Sate ULy

Email: mjgarcia@glendaleca.gov Amaurer(@ci.glendale.ca.us

Superior Court of California County of Los Angeles

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

CITY OF GLENDALE, a municipal CASE NO. BC 707005 corporation,

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND

Plaintiff, EQUITABLE RELIEF FOR:

Vs. 1. Breach of Express Warranty;

) ) ) ) ) | | . 2. Breach of Implied Warranty of Fitness; ASP HOLDINGS, INC. dba ASPECT LED, g 3. Breach of Imghcd War rang/, of ) ) ) ) ) ) ) )

a Minnesota corporation; and DOES 1-50, Meérchantability; inclusive, 4. Strict Product Liability; and S. Negligence.

Defendants.

On information and belief, Plaintiff City of Glendale complains and alleges as follows:

PARTIES

. At all times mentioned in this Complaint, Plaintiff City of Glendale was and 1s a

municipal corporation organized and existing under its charter as well as: under the laws of the

State of California, and is located within Los Angeles County, and has duly authorized the

preparation and filing of this Complaint.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLENDALE CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF GLENDALE A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA MICHAEL J. CITY ATTORNEY