Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2021 at 13:53:36 (UTC).

CITY OF GARDENA VS GENERAL REINSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 CITY OF GARDENA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL REINSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0032

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF GARDENA

Defendant

GENERAL REINSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

STOLL RICHARD MARTIN

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

4/16/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

4/9/2021: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

4/7/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Proof of Personal Service

3/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/21/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/21/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/13/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2021
  • Hearing08/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Removal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing); Filed by City of Gardena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by General Reinsurance Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by City of Gardena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by City of Gardena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by City of Gardena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by City of Gardena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF GARDENA is a litigant

Latest cases where GENERAL REINSURANCE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STOLL RICHARD MARTIN