This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/18/2021 at 12:22:00 (UTC).

CITY OF EL SEGUNDO VS VERIZON CALIFORNIA, A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 CITY OF EL SEGUNDO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VERIZON CALIFORNIA, A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4670

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF EL SEGUNDO

Defendant

VERIZON CALIFORNIA A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SANDOVAL KATHERINE A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

12/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

12/10/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/20/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/20/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/20/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2023
  • Hearing11/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Hearing05/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • Hearing05/06/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by City of El Segundo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by City of El Segundo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by City of El Segundo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF EL SEGUNDO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANDOVAL KATHERINE A. ESQ.