This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 09:34:26 (UTC).

CITY OF EL MONTE VS REGENCY OUTDOOR ADVERTISING, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 CITY OF EL MONTE filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against REGENCY OUTDOOR ADVERTISING, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0565

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF EL MONTE

Defendant

REGENCY OUTDOOR ADVERTISING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEMIEUX ALEXANDER P.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (REGENCY OUTDOOR ADVERTISING, INC.)

7/13/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (REGENCY OUTDOOR ADVERTISING, INC.)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

7/13/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

7/12/2021: Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/12/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

7/12/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/12/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • Hearing11/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • Hearing11/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Regency Outdoor Advertising, Inc.)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by City of El Monte (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by City of El Monte (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by City of El Monte (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by City of El Monte (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REGENCY OUTDOOR ADVERTSISING INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF EL MONTE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEMIEUX, ALEXANDER P.