This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/11/2021 at 02:03:45 (UTC).

CITY OF EL MONTE, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL CORPORATION VS ZHI QIANG CHEN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 CITY OF EL MONTE, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ZHI QIANG CHEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0472

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF EL MONTE A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Defendants

CHEN DAN LING

CHEN ZHI QIANG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IMOISILI ALUYAH IMONITIE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/8/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/8/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/7/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/21/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/23/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/16/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

9/13/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • Hearing10/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • Hearing10/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Reassignment); Filed by CITY OF EL MONTE, a California municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CITY OF EL MONTE, a California municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CITY OF EL MONTE, a California municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CITY OF EL MONTE, a California municipal corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF EL MONTE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer IMOISILI ALUYAH